Jones v. Science Applications International Corporation
Plaintiff: Julia "JD" Jones
Defendant: Science Applications International Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01639
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/2/2019. (AHI)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than January 13, 2019; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after January 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/2/2019. (AHI)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 12/18/2019 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/2/2019. (AHI )
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Science Applications International Corporation. filed by Science Applications International Corporation (Phillips, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Science Applications International Corporation.(Phillips, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file an answer by November 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on November 5, 2019. (HKM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 11/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Science Applications International Corporation. (Phillips, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia "JD" Jones. Science Applications International Corporation served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Michel, Anthony)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Science Applications International Corporation. (AHI)
October 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601101254 (AHI)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Science Applications International Corporation filed by Julia "JD" Jones.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Science Applications International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Science Applications International Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Tae Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia "JD" Jones
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?