Eyster et al v. Alabama Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Susan Noble, John C. Eyster, James S. Speake, John B. Noble and Lawrence C. Weaver
Defendant: Mark Barlett, Federal Highway Administration, Alabama Department of Transportation and John R. Cooper
Case Number: 5:2020cv00172
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, Susan Noble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint)(Rose, Connor)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File. Finding good cause, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. 13). Plaintiffs may file their Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/3/2020. (RAC)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, Susan Noble, James S. Speake, Lawrence C. Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Brown, T)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Alabama Department of Transportation to file an answer is EXTENDED to 4/27/2020. The deadline for John R. Cooper to file an answer is EXTENDED to 4/27/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/28/2020. (RAC)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/27/2020. (RAC)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, D)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve Third Party Production Subpoena by John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, Susan Noble, James S. Speake, Lawrence C. Weaver. (Brown, T)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, Susan Noble, James S. Speake, Lawrence C. Weaver of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Non-Party (Brown, T)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, Susan Noble. Mark Barlett served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Brown, T)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, Susan Noble. John R. Cooper served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Brown, T)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, Susan Noble. Alabama Department of Transportation served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Brown, T)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, Susan Noble, James S. Speake, Lawrence C. Weaver. filed by John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, Susan Noble, James S. Speake, Lawrence C. Weaver (Brown, T)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, Susan Noble.(Brown, T)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alabama Department of Transportation, Mark Barlett, John R. Cooper, and Federal Highway Administration by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
February 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3531233 (Receipt number B4601103933). related document #1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against All Defendants filed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, and Susan Noble.(AHI). (Brown, T) Modified on 2/10/2020 (BJL).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against All Defendants filed by Lawrence C. Weaver, John C. Eyster, John B. Noble, James S. Speake, and Susan Noble.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyster et al v. Alabama Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Noble
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Connor J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Eyster
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Connor J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Speake
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Connor J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Noble
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Connor J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence C. Weaver
Represented By: T Michael Brown
Represented By: Connor J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Transportation
Represented By: J Alan Truitt
Represented By: D Bart Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Cooper
Represented By: J Alan Truitt
Represented By: D Bart Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?