Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Benny Bird Company Inc, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Nashville Star Music, Tokeco Tunes, Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Interior Music Corp, Suffer in Silence Music and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Justin Gilley, Tyler Schuman and Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ
Case Number: 5:2020cv00185
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal, the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs claims against Defendants, without costs to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/25/20. (BJL)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Pewitt, James)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Justin Gilley. "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward." (BJL)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
February 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Pewitt, James)
February 15, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3537050 (receipt number B4601104144). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman filed by Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Benny Bird Company Inc, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Tokeco Tunes, Interior Music Corp, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Nashville Star Music, and Songs of Universal, Inc..(BJL). (Pewitt, James) Modified on 2/19/2020 (BJL).
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Benny Bird Company Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Fake and Jaded Music, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Interior Music Corp, Less Than Zero Music, Nashville Star Music, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Southfield Road Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Tokeco Tunes, and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (BJL)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Gilley, Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ, and Tyler Schuman filed by Less Than Zero Music, Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music, Suffer in Silence Music, Benny Bird Company Inc, Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing, Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs, Tokeco Tunes, Interior Music Corp, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Nashville Star Music, and Songs of Universal, Inc..(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Bird Company Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV d/b/a Sony/AT Tree Publishing
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southfield Road Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fake and Jaded Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc d/b/a Irving Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fall Out Boy Inc d/b/a Chicago X Softcore Songs
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashville Star Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Less Than Zero Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company d/b/a Tiltawhirl Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sams Jammin Songs
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs, LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffer in Silence Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Schuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe's BBQ Cullman LLC d/b/a Moe's Original BBQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?