John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al
Case Number: 5:2020cv00187
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352 Miller Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:19-cv-02924. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting #20 Motion to Change Venue; Case TRANSFERRED to the United States District for the Northern District of Alabama; directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/12/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Baggette Construction, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc..(Geewax, Allison) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION to Change Venue filed by John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit))(Geewax, Allison) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue by Baggette Construction, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. by Baggette Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants, Baggette Construction, Inc. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company, shall filetheir respective responsive pleading to #1 Complaint no later than January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/3/2019. (tb2s, Chambers) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Waiver of Service Executed, #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #1 Complaint, by Baggette Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Baggette Construction, Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baggette Construction, Inc. (McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Hartford Fire Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019.(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Baggette Construction, Inc.. Baggette Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019.(McLaughlin, Lauren) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/7/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. or counsel for John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/21/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baggette Construction, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by U.S. ex rel John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. (Geewax, Allison) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8276520.), filed by U.S. ex rel John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Geewax, Allison) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John E. Kelly & Sons Electrical Construction, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?