Lacy v. City of Huntsville Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Angelia Lacy
Defendant: Huntsville City Council, Jennie Robinson, Will Culver, Bill Kling, Jr, Devyn Keith, Frances Akridge and City of Huntsville Alabama
Case Number: 5:2020cv00289
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Huntsville Alabama by Angelia Lacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Lampley, Joe) Modified on 4/22/2020 (AHI ).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING FEWER THAN ALL DEFENDANTS: Plaintiff's voluntary motion to dismiss fewer than all defendants is GRANTED and Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Frances Akridge and Will Culver are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/16/2020. (AHI)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Frances Akridge, City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Frances Akridge, City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson. (Canupp, David)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/30/2020. (AHI)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Less than all Defendants by Angelia Lacy. (Lampley, Joe)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Angelia Lacy. (Lampley, Joe)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 Brief re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Frances Akridge, City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson. (Canupp, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Frances Akridge, City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson. (Canupp, David)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Devyn Keith served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Frances Akridge served on 3/6/2020, answer due by 3/27/2020 (Lampley, Joe) Modified on 3/9/2020 (AHI).
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Jennie Robinson served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Bill Kling, Jr served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Huntsville City Council served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. City of Huntsville Alabama served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Lacy. Will Culver served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lampley, Joe)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Frances Akridge, City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Huntsville City Council, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, and Jennie Robinson. (AHI)
March 4, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3550111 (B4601104555). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Angelia Lacy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(AHI). (Lampley, Joe) Modified on 3/5/2020 (AHI).
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Angelia Lacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacy v. City of Huntsville Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville City Council
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Robinson
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Culver
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Kling, Jr
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devyn Keith
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Akridge
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Huntsville Alabama
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Lacy
Represented By: Joe N Lampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?