Johnson v. Stanton et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Johnson
Defendant: Roger D. Shannon, H. Fenwick Huss, Balan Nair, Michael Foliano, Thomas R. Stanton, Jacqueline H. Rice, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone and Kathryn A. Walker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00447
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:20-cv-447-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Motions for Leave for Brian Barnes, Perry Corley, and B. Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/11/20. (BJL)
May 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3587562 (receipt number B4601105860). (Goodman, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (BJL).
May 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3587557 (receipt number B4601105858). (Goodman, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (BJL).
May 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3587543 (receipt number B4601105859). (Goodman, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (BJL).
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission B. Warren Pope Motion is RIPE 5/8/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Michael Foliano, H. Fenwick Huss, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone, Balan Nair, Jacqueline H. Rice, Roger D. Shannon, Thomas R. Stanton, Kathryn A. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodman, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Limited Admission Jessica Perry Corley Motion is RIPE 5/8/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Michael Foliano, H. Fenwick Huss, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone, Balan Nair, Jacqueline H. Rice, Roger D. Shannon, Thomas R. Stanton, Kathryn A. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodman, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Limited Admission Brian Davis Barnes Motion is RIPE 5/8/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Michael Foliano, H. Fenwick Huss, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone, Balan Nair, Jacqueline H. Rice, Roger D. Shannon, Thomas R. Stanton, Kathryn A. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3566312. related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael Foliano, H. Fenwick Huss, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone, Balan Nair, Jacqueline H. Rice, Roger D. Shannon, Thomas R. Stanton, and Kathryn A. Walker filed by Matthew Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(BJL). (Brown, W) Modified on 4/2/2020 (BJL).
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael Foliano, H. Fenwick Huss, William L. Marks, Gregory McCray, Anthony J. Melone, Balan Nair, Jacqueline H. Rice, Roger D. Shannon, Thomas R. Stanton, and Kathryn A. Walker filed by Matthew Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Stanton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger D. Shannon
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Fenwick Huss
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balan Nair
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Foliano
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Stanton
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline H. Rice
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Marks
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory McCray
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Melone
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn A. Walker
Represented By: Brian Davis Barnes
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: John E Goodman
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Johnson
Represented By: W Tucker Brown
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?