Winkles v. Booz Allen Hamilton Inc
Plaintiff: Joyce Winkles
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00605
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/16/2020. (AHI)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Booz Allen Hamilton Inc.(Phillips, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED and Booz Allen Hamilton Inc answer is due 6/16/2020. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/2/2020. (AHI )
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. filed by Booz Allen Hamilton Inc (Phillips, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. (Phillips, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Booz Allen Hamilton Inc served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (AHI)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Booz Allen Hamilton Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601004467 (BJL)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joyce Winkles. (AHI)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Booz Allen Hamilton Inc filed by Joyce Winkles.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkles v. Booz Allen Hamilton Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton Inc
Represented By: Matthew Tae Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Winkles
Represented By: Jay E Emerson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?