Brown v. Lambert et al
Plaintiff: Seth Wesley Brown
Defendant: Robert Piteo, Guy Lambert, Johnathon Grigsby and City of Florence, Alabama
Case Number: 5:2020cv00628
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #2 Motion to Change Venue. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendants' motion to transfer the case to the Northwestern Division on or before July 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/30/2020. (KBW)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Michael Berry on behalf of Johnathon Grigsby, Guy Lambert, Robert Piteo (Berry, Ian)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Change Venue to Northwestern Division by Johnathon Grigsby, Guy Lambert, Robert Piteo. (Moore, Larry)
May 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3585091 (receipt number B4601105788). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Seth Wesley Brown.(AHI ). (Woodall, Willard) Modified on 5/7/2020 (BJL).
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Seth Wesley Brown.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Lambert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Wesley Brown
Represented By: Ashley Wallace Feltman
Represented By: Willard Brent Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Piteo
Represented By: Ian Michael Berry
Represented By: Larry B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Lambert
Represented By: Ian Michael Berry
Represented By: Larry B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathon Grigsby
Represented By: Ian Michael Berry
Represented By: Larry B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Florence, Alabama
Represented By: Ian Michael Berry
Represented By: Larry B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?