Woods v. Quicken Loans Inc
Plaintiff: Lacy Woods
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00640
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/30/2020. (AHI)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/26/2020. (RAC)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/26/2020. (RAC)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration by Quicken Loans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McCoy, Douglas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration by Quicken Loans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(McCoy, Douglas)
June 24, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3616480 (B460116740). (McCoy, Douglas) Modified on 6/25/2020 (AHI).
June 24, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3616479 (B4601106739). (McCoy, Douglas) Modified on 6/25/2020 (AHI).
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Quicken Loans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McCoy, Douglas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Quicken Loans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McCoy, Douglas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:20-cv-640-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Quicken Loans Inc (McCoy, Douglas)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint by June 25, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on May 28, 2020. (ADH)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 5/27/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Quicken Loans Inc. (McCoy, Douglas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Quicken Loans Inc served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (BJL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lacy Woods. (Bartlett, Taylor)
May 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3586049 (B4601105818). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans Inc filed by Lacy Woods.(BJL). (Bartlett, Taylor)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans Inc filed by Lacy Woods.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Quicken Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Douglas L McCoy
Represented By: Brooks R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Woods
Represented By: Taylor C Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?