Williams v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Julius Dave Williams
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and MDDH Holdings LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00913
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eri
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 2/8/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2021; Trial Ready by 8/2021; Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2020 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/6/2020. (AHI )
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Walters, Jason)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/23/2020. (AHI)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal; defendant, MDDH Holdings LLC is terminated as a defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/8/2020. (AHI)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Walters, Jason)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal as to Certain Defendant by Julius Dave Williams. (Hampton, Kenneth)
June 26, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3618791 (B4601106806). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MDDH Holdings LLC and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Madison County, AL, case number 47-CV-2020-900731 filed by MDDH Holdings LLC and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI). (Walters, Jason) Modified on 6/30/2020 (BJL).
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MDDH Holdings LLC and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Madison County, AL, case number 47-CV-2020-900731 filed by MDDH Holdings LLC and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDDH Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Dave Williams
Represented By: Kenneth D Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?