Walker v. Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC
Plaintiff: Patti Walker
Defendant: Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00966
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 HIPAA ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/20. (BJL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order Motion is RIPE 9/3/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moss, William) Modified on 9/3/2020 (BJL).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2021. Motions due by 9/1/2021. The parties shall be ready for trial to be scheduled after December 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/10/20. (BJL)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/10/20. (BJL)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Patti Walker and Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC. (BJL)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moss, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601107081 (BJL)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 24, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:00 a.m. on Monday, August 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF REMOVAL by Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC (BJL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC (BJL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC from the Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2020-900821. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)
June 22, 2020 ***ANSWER filed in state court on 6/22/2020*** (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topgolf USA Huntsville, LLC
Represented By: William Walker Moss
Represented By: Glenn E Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Walker
Represented By: Gary W Lackey
Represented By: Robert E Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?