Thomas v. Kohler Company Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Defendant: Kohler Company Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00994
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/3/2020. (RAC)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/3/2020. (RAC)
September 3, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number 1126-3664745 (B4601108190) (AHI) Modified on 9/4/2020 (BJL).
September 3, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3664748 (B4601108191). (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 9/4/2020 (BJL).
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael Yellin by Kohler Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Yellin, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bradford, Stacey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jennifer L. Ciralsky by Kohler Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer L. Ciralsky, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bradford, Stacey)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REVISED INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/20/2020. (AHI)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The #6 Initial Order is STRICKEN; a revised order will follow. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/20/2020. (AHI)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to clarify Uniform Initial Order by Donald Thomas. (Mastando, Teresa)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ****STRICKEN PER 8 TEXT ORDER ISSUED ON 8/20/2020*** INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/7/2020. (AHI) Modified on 8/20/2020 (AHI).
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kohler Company Inc.. filed by Kohler Company Inc. (Bradford, Stacey)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kohler Company Inc..(Bradford, Stacey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Thomas. Kohler Company Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Mastando, Teresa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Kohler Company Inc. (AHI)
July 13, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1126-3628544 (B4601107148) (AHI) Modified on 7/15/2020 (AHI).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kohler Company Inc. filed by Donald Thomas.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Kohler Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler Company Inc.
Represented By: Michael Yellin
Represented By: Jennifer L Ciralsky
Represented By: Stacey T Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?