Haynes v. Headley et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Haynes
Defendant: Steven T Marshall, Joseph Headley and Cullman, Alabama
Case Number: 5:2020cv01020
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Allen Haynes is GRANTED; Respondents shall show cause within 42 days why the relief requested should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/6/2020. (KAM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Allen Haynes. Originally Filed on 08/03/2020 in Middle District of Alabama (MEB2)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Petitioner must either file a verified application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the fling fee of $5.00 within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/20/2020. (MEB2)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00369. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Case transferred to United States District Court, Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (dmn, ) (no pdf) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: On June 8, 2020, the Magistrate Judge entered a Recommendation (doc #2 ) to which no timely objections have been filed. After an independent review of the file and upon consideration of the Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/17/2020. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 29, 2020 No objections filed to the #2 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Objections to R&R due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/2020. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christopher Allen Haynes. (No IFP/ No Filing Fee)(imm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Headley et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullman, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?