Bates v. Peters et al
Petitioner: Earl Eugene Bates, Jr
Respondent: Gwendolyn Givens, Jefferson J Dunn and Kenneth Peters
Case Number: 5:2020cv01188
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear in Court by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- Although the petitioner filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the application was not accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. The petitioner must file a new verified application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 09/14/2020. (AKD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (MEB2)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING-Petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. Petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 08/21/2020. (AKD)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl Eugene Bates, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson J Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?