Alexander v. Gentry et al
Plaintiff: Caleb D Alexander
Defendant: Floyd Lee, Matt Houge, Matt Gentry and Jeff Roberts
Case Number: 5:2020cv01206
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Caleb D Alexander (MEB2)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee of $4.67, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/21/2020. (KAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Caleb D Alexander. (KAM)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - the plaintiff must either file a verified application to proceed ifp or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/21/2020. (KAM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matt Gentry, Matt Houge, Floyd Lee, Jeff Roberts, filed by Caleb D Alexander.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Houge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb D Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?