Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday Inc
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo and Michael Sarlo
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01273
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Madeline E. Hughes terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on October 23, 2020. (HKM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 10/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Ruby Tuesday Inc. (Hughes, Madeline)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This action is STAYED, parties are to promptly advise the court of any developments affecting said stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/8/2020. (AHI)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc. by Ruby Tuesday Inc. filed by Ruby Tuesday Inc (Andress, D)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 9, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/20. (BJL)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruby Tuesday Inc.(Andress, D)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline E. Hughes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday Inc (Hughes, Madeline)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by D Keith Andress on behalf of Ruby Tuesday Inc (Andress, D)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo. Ruby Tuesday Inc served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Brown, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday Inc. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (MEB2)
September 1, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3662737 (B4601108136). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday Inc filed by Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(BJL). (Brown, David) Modified on 9/2/2020 (BJL).
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lory Sarlo and Michael Sarlo. (BJL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday Inc filed by Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sarlo
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday Inc
Represented By: Madeline E. Hughes
Represented By: D Keith Andress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?