Beckwith v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Courtney Lashay Brooks Beckwith
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2020cv01696
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 11/27/2020, answer due 2/25/2021. (BJL)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to USM for service. (MEB2)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on October 29, 2020. (ADH)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 10/29/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Courtney Lashay Brooks Beckwith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(BJL)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Courtney Lashay Brooks Beckwith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckwith v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Lashay Brooks Beckwith
Represented By: Seth B Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?