Rucker v. CRP Sweet et al
Plaintiff: Kendall R Rucker and Ken
Defendant: CRP Sweet, Faulkner, Sgt Driggers, Hubberd and Ron Puckett
Case Number: 5:2020cv01745
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 #4 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay an Initial Partial Filing Fee of $29.98 in order to commence this action, plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/1/2020. (JLC)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendall R Rucker. (MEB2)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is deficient for the reasons indicated. Plaintiff must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order in the manner explained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(JLC)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendall R Rucker. (MEB2)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRP Sweet, Faulkner, Hubberd, Ron Puckett, Sgt Driggers, filed by Kendall R Rucker. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucker v. CRP Sweet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall R Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRP Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubberd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?