New South Media Group LLC v. City of Huntsville, Alabama
Plaintiff: New South Media Group LLC
Defendant: City of Huntsville, Alabama
Case Number: 5:2020cv02050
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court GRANTS the #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and CANCELS the hearing set for 2/23/2021; reply to motion for preliminary injunction is due 3/15/2021; any amended complaint must be filed by 3/15/2021; response to Motion to Abstain is due by 3/15/2021; reply is due by 3/29/2021; joint status report is due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/16/2021. (AHI)
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Adjourn Hearing on Motion for Injunction by New South Media Group LLC. (Webb, E)
February 10, 2021 Filing 24 Evidentiary Material re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #23 Opposition (other), #21 MOTION to Abstain . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Trey Riley and Exhibits Thereto, #2 Affidavit of Thomas Nunez and Exhibits Thereto, #3 Affidavit of Scott Phares and Exhibits Thereto, #4 State Court Filings)(Canupp, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 23 Opposition to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David) Modified on 2/11/2021 (AHI ).
February 10, 2021 Filing 22 Brief re #21 MOTION to Abstain filed by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Abstain and Stay Case by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David) Modified on 2/11/2021 (AHI).
February 10, 2021 Filing 20 Brief re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for the defendant's brief in support of its opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction is enlarged to 35 pages. The page limit for the plaintiff's reply is enlarged to 20 pages. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/8/2021. (KBW)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by City of Huntsville, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Defendant's response to the motion for preliminary injunction is due by 2/10/2021; plaintiff's reply is due by 2/17/2021; Oral argument is set for 2/23/2021 02:30 PM in Federal Courthouse. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/21/2021. (AHI)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/21/2021. (AHI)
January 20, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/2021; Dustin Kennemer and Adam Webb present for the plaintiff; David Canupp, Allison Chandler, and Stephanie Gushlaw present for defendant. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (SPT )
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Margaret Gushlaw on behalf of City of Huntsville, Alabama (Gushlaw, Stephanie)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B Chandler on behalf of City of Huntsville, Alabama (Chandler, Allison)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Canupp on behalf of City of Huntsville, Alabama (Canupp, David)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 1/20/2021 at 3:00 p.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/20/21. (SPT )
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:20-cv-2050-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 Evidentiary Material re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Volume 1 of 1 - Declaration of Neil Bell and Exhibits A - H). (Webb, E)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Webb, E)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by New South Media Group LLC. (Webb, E)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for E. Adam Webb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/23/20. (BJL)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 12/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by New South Media Group LLC. (Kennemer, Dustin)
December 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3740728 (B4601110425). (Kennemer, Dustin) Modified on 12/28/2020 (BJL).
December 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3740634 (B4601110421). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Huntsville, Alabama, filed by New South Media Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Kennemer, Dustin) Modified on 12/28/2020 (BJL).
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New South Media Group LLC. City of Huntsville, Alabama waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/20/2021. (McMurtrie, Lloyd)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by New South Media Group LLC. (BJL)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Huntsville, Alabama, filed by New South Media Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New South Media Group LLC v. City of Huntsville, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New South Media Group LLC
Represented By: Dustin W Kennemer
Represented By: Lloyd T McMurtrie
Represented By: E Adam Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Huntsville, Alabama
Represented By: Allison B Chandler
Represented By: David J Canupp
Represented By: Stephanie Margaret Gushlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?