Lyons et al v. Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms
Plaintiff: Donald Lyons and Jillian Lyons
Defendant: Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms
Case Number: 5:2021cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Donald Lyons, Jillian Lyons. (Garmon, Matthew)
January 13, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3751590 (B4601110781). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms filed by Jillian Lyons and Donald Lyons.(BJL). (Wheeles, M) Modified on 1/14/2021 (BJL).
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms filed by Jillian Lyons and Donald Lyons.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons et al v. Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lyons
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Garmon
Represented By: M Todd Wheeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Lyons
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Garmon
Represented By: M Todd Wheeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saeilo Inc D/B/A Kahr Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?