Carmichael v. Wexford Health Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Carmichael
Defendant: Castle Berry, Dr. Hooper, Wexford Health Services Incorporated and Dr. Gulati
Case Number: 5:2021cv00096
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Plaintiff has 30 additional days to comply with #3 order issued on 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/9/2021. (AHI)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roderick Carmichael (AHI)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court DENIES the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Filing fee of $402.00 is due within 30 days from the date this order is entered, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/27/2021. (AHI)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Carmichael. (AHI)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roderick Carmichael. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmichael v. Wexford Health Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gulati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?