Cent Holding Company LLC et al v. Wolfram Research Inc
Plaintiff: Cent Holding Company LLC and Cent Capital LLC
Defendant: Wolfram Research Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00418
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs Status Report or, Alternatively, Motion to Continue all Hearings; the motion is GRANTED and all hearings are CONTINUED GENERALLY; the pending #81 Motion for Summary Judgment is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED; The parties SHALL submit a status report within ninety (90) days; Plaintiffs SHALL ALSO promptly submit an interim status report upon any material developments in counsels efforts to obtain the Petition for Conservatorship mentioned in the Status Report or upon any other relevant developments. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/16/2022. (KAM)
November 15, 2022 Filing 106 STATUS REPORT by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Maze, Clint)
November 15, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint L Maze on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Maze, Clint)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TEXT ORDER In light of the courts recent order granting the motions to withdraw by some of Plaintiffs counsel (Docs. # 101, 102), the status conference previously scheduled for Thursday, October 27, 2022 at 11:30 A.M. is CONTINUED GENERALLY. Within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order, Plaintiffs counsel SHALL submit a status report updating the court on the efforts to obtain new local counsel and designate lead counsel. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/25/2022. (KAM)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER This matter is before the court on the Motions to Withdraw by Steven Nicholas, William Earl Bonner, John Thomas Richie, and Carson S. Phillips. (Docs. # 101, 102). The Motions (Docs. # 101, 102) are GRANTED. Attorneys Steven Nicholas, William Earl Bonner, John Thomas Richie, and Carson S. Phillips are hereby TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2022. (KAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Richie, John)
October 24, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Nicholas, Steve)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. [81 filed under seal]. The court SETS this matter for a status conference in Courtroom 8 of the Hugo L. Black U.S Courthouse on Thursday, October 27, 2022 at 11:30 A.M. to discuss the possibility of holding a computer science day to educate the court about the technical information presented in this case and narrowing the scope of the issues before the court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/18/2022. (KAM)
June 27, 2022 Filing 99 ***Document Sealed** Plaintiffs' List of Trade Secrets and Misappropriation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM)
June 27, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC re 86 Order,, Terminate Motions, Notice of Conventional Filing (Phillips, Carson)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER This case is before the court on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. # 81 filed under seal). On or before Monday, June 27, 2022, Plaintiffs SHALL file with the court a list of what information they contend to be a trade secret; As to each trade secret identified, Plaintiffs SHALL also include a citation to those portions of the record showing that Defendant misappropriated the trade secret at issue.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/13/2022. (KAM)
May 23, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc re #81 SEALED MOTION, #82 Document Sealed,, #83 Document Sealed Notice of Redacted Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wolfram's March 2022 Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Wolframs' Evidentiary Submission Cover Sheet and Index, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6, #9 Exhibit Ex. 7, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10, #13 Exhibit Ex. 11, #14 Exhibit Ex. 12, #15 Exhibit Ex. 13, #16 Exhibit Ex. 14, #17 Exhibit Ex. 15, #18 Exhibit Ex. 16, #19 Exhibit Ex. 17, #20 Exhibit Ex. 18, #21 Exhibit Ex. 19, #22 Exhibit Ex. 20, #23 Exhibit Ex. 21, #24 Exhibit Ex. 22, #25 Exhibit Ex. 23, #26 Exhibit Ex. 24, #27 Exhibit Ex. 25, #28 Exhibit Ex. 26, #29 Exhibit Ex. 27, #30 Exhibit Ex. 28, #31 Exhibit Ex. 29, #32 Exhibit Ex. 30, #33 Exhibit Ex. 31, #34 Exhibit Ex. 32, #35 Exhibit Wolfram's Brief in Support of March 2022 Motion for Summary Judgment)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 95 ***Document Sealed Declaration of Michael Kelly in support of Wolfram's Motion for Summary Judgment (KAM)
May 20, 2022 Filing 94 ***Document Sealed Supplemental Declaration of Fahim Chandurwala in support of Wolfram's Motion for Summary Judgment (KAM)
May 20, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc re #91 Evidentiary Material, Notice of Conventional Filing Under Seal (Snyder, Daniel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 92 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Wolfram Research Inc re: #81 SEALED MOTION, #82 Document Sealed,, #91 Evidentiary Material, #83 Document Sealed Defendant Wolframs Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Snyder, Daniel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 91 Evidentiary Material re: 86 Order,, Terminate Motions, #82 Document Sealed,, Supplemental Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 35)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER The court received an informal request on behalf of Defendant Wolfram Research Inc. to extend its deadline to file a Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. The court understands that the request is unopposed, and GRANTS the request. Defendant SHALL file its Reply Brief on or before May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/5/2022. (KAM)
April 27, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING (Phillips, Carson)
April 27, 2022 Filing 88 ***Document Sealed - Evidentiary Submission in Support of #87 Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29) (KEK)
April 27, 2022 Filing 87 ***Document Sealed - Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to #81 Motion. (KEK)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion to File Under Seal. #85 . The Motion #85 is GRANTED. Plaintiff MAY file its Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal, and Defendant MAY file a reply brief under seal. The parties SHALL file public versions of their motions after the sealed submissions are docketed. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/27/2022. (KEK)
April 27, 2022 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Seal by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Phillips, Carson)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER - The court received an informal request on behalf of Plaintiffs Cent Capital LLC and Cent Holding Company LLC to extend the deadline of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. The court GRANTS the request. Plaintiff SHALL file its Response on or before April 27, 2022. Defendant SHALL file its Reply Brief on or before May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/21/2022. (KAM)
March 28, 2022 Filing 83 ***Document Sealed*** Defendant's Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (KAM)
March 28, 2022 Filing 82 ***Document Sealed** Defendant's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32) (KAM)
March 28, 2022 Filing 81 ** SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wolfram Research Inc. (KAM)
March 25, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc of Conventional Filing (Snyder, Daniel)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Amie M. Bauer. #78 Defendant Wolfram Research, Inc. will continue to be represented by other attorneys. Therefore, the Motion #78 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate attorney Bauer. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/11/2022. (KEK)
March 11, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wolfram Research Inc. (Bauer, Amie)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on an informal request from the parties for an agreed fourteen-day extension of the current preliminary injunction and summary judgment briefing deadlines. The informal request is GRANTED. The court ADOPTS the following deadlines: motions SHALL be filed on or before March 25, 2022; responses SHALL be filed on or before April 22, 2022; and replies SHALL be filed on or before May 4, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/11/2022. (KEK)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties Joint Status Report Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule #73 . The court ADOPTS the parties proposed deadlines: motions filed on or before March 11, 2022; responses filed on or before April 8, 2022; and replies filed on or before April 20, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/2/2022. (KAM)
February 2, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Nicholas on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Nicholas, Steven)
February 2, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by William Earl Bonner on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Bonner, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT REGARDING PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE [JOINT] by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Richie, John)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties Joint Status Report Regarding Progress of Limited Discovery #71 . The parties SHALL submit a joint status report addressing motion practice on or before January 31, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/11/2022. (KAM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT REGARDING PROGRESS OF LIMITED DISCOVERY by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Richie, John)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/3/2022. (KAM)
December 23, 2021 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Snyder, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ORDER - The parties previously proposed deadlines #66 , which the court adopted 67 . The parties, however, have informally notified the court that they will not meet these deadlines. The parties SHALL submit a joint report with new discovery and motion deadlines on or before January 10, 2022. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/17/2021. (KAM)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER - The parties have proposed an amended discovery schedule in this case #66 . The court adopts their recommendation. Accordingly, the parties SHALL exchange limited discovery requests on or before September 29, 2021; exchange objections to limited requests on or before October 11, 2021; meet and confer regarding all objections on or before October 14, 2021; complete limited written discovery on or before October 29, 2021; complete limited depositions (if any, subject to witness availability) on or before November 16, 2021; file motions on or before November 19, 2021; respond to motions on or before December 10, 2021; and reply to motions on or before December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/25/2021. (KAM)
September 23, 2021 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Richie, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Amended Complaint by Wolfram Research Inc.(Gaines, Floyd)
September 3, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Castor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Castor, Bruce)
September 3, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael van der Veen on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (van der Veen, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER - The parties pending motions [53, 54] are TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant SHALL file an answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #47 on or before September 16, 2021. The parties SHALL meet and confer on or before September 16, 2021 and file a joint report on or before September 23, 2021, which provides their proposal(s) regarding preliminary discovery and motion practice. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/2/2021. (KAM)
September 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 9/2/2021. As discussed, the currently pending motions will be terminated and parties shall meet and confer to resolve disputed issues. Responsive pleading to complaint shall be filed within 14 days. The court will enter a separate order. (KLL)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties Joint Motion for a Status Conference #60 . The motion #60 is GRANTED. The matter is SET for a telephonic conference on Thursday, September 2, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to dial-in to the conference by calling 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/31/2021. (KAM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 60 Joint MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Richie, John)
August 30, 2021 Filing 59 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Richie, John)
August 27, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc re #56 Document Sealed, #55 Document Sealed,, #54 SEALED MOTION - NOTICE OF REDACTED FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wolfram's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Wolframs Evidence Submitted in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit Wolfram's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Gaines, Floyd)
August 26, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC re #53 SEALED MOTION OF REDACTED FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Brief for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Richie, John)
August 23, 2021 Filing 56 ***Document Sealed*** Defendant Wolfram's Brief in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (KAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 55 ***Document Sealed*** Defendant Wolfram's Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21) (KAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 54 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Wolfram Research Inc. (KAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 53 SEALED MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(KAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc re 51 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Notice of Conventional Filing (Gaines, Floyd)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties Joint Motion to File Under Seal #50 . The Motion #50 is GRANTED. Plaintiff MAY file its motion for preliminary injunction under seal, and Defendant MAY file its motion for summary judgment under seal. The parties SHALL file public versions of their motions after the sealed submissions are docketed.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2021. (KAM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Richie, John)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant's unopposed informal motion for an extension of time. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #47 on or before August 23, 2021. The parties SHALL conduct their Rule 26(f) conference on or before August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/12/2021. (KEK)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties informal motion to extend deadlines. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #47 on or before August 16, 2021. The parties SHALL conduct their Rule 26(f) conference on or before August 23, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/2/2021. (KAM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cent Holding Company LLC, Cent Capital LLC, filed by Cent Holding Company LLC, Cent Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Richie, John)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time #42 . For the reasons discussed at the status conference on June 28, 2021, the Motion #42 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs SHALL file their amended pleadings on or before July 26, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/29/2021. (KAM)
June 28, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time [OPPOSED] filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Snyder, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 6/28/2021. As discussed at the conference, Plaintiff will be allowed an additional 30 days to file an amended complaint and motion for preliminary injunction. (KLL)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the status conference set for 2:00pm on June 28, 2021. Both parties SHALL have at least on representative present in Courtroom 8 for the status conference. Remaining counsel SHALL participate by calling 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/25/2021. (KWC, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #42 . This case is SET for a status conference at 2:00 p.m. on June 28, 2021 in Courtroom 8 located on the 8th floor of the Hugo L. Black Federal Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/25/2021. (KEK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time [OPPOSED] by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B)(Richie, John)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties informal joint motion for an extension of time for Plaintiff to file its amended pleadings. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL file its amended pleadings on or before June 25, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2021. (KAM)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on an informal request from the parties for a one-week extension of the deadline for Plaintiff to file its amended pleading. The request is GRANTED. Plaintiffs deadline to file its amended pleading is EXTENDED to June 18, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/10/2021. (KAM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER - The court has been informed of the parties proposed scheduling deadlines. The following deadlines SHALL govern: Plaintiffs amended complaint and amended motion for preliminary injunction are to be served on Defendant on or before June 3, 2021; the parties are to meet and confer on or before June 9, 2021; and Plaintiff is to file its amended pleading and motion on or before June 11, 2021. Deadlines for response and reply to Plaintiffs amended motion SHALL be governed by the courts Initial Order #27 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/3/2021. (KAM)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 and Defendants Motion to Dismiss #9 . Because Plaintiffs have informed the court that the complaint will be amended, the Motions are no longer directed to the operative complaint. Therefore, the Motions [2,9] are ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/27/2021. (KAM)
May 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2021. Pending motions will be administratively terminated as discussed. Amended complaint will be filed after the parties meet and confer to discuss proposed schedule of deadlines. The court will enter a separate written order. (KLL)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Attorney Gregory A. Brockwell #36 . Plaintiff's Motion #36 is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED as MOOT in light of the court's amended Order 35 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/26/2021. (KEK)
May 25, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Gregory A. Brockwell and Brockwell Smith LLC by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Brockwell, Gregory)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Order terminating Attorney Kenneth E. Riley 33 . The court AMENDS its order and terminates Attorney Gregory A. Brockwell in addition to Attorney Riley. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/2021. (KEK)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . This case is SET for a telephonic status conference on May 27, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/2021. (KEK)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Attorney Kenneth E. Riley's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #32 . The Motion #32 is GRANTED. Attorney Riley is hereby TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/2021. (KEK)
May 24, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Riley, Kenneth)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motions for Pro Hac Vice seeking admissions of Attorney Bruce L. Castor, Jr. #29 and Attorney Michael T. Van Der Veen #30 . The Motions [29, 30] are GRANTED. Attorney Castor, Jr. and Attorney Van Der Veen are accordingly granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/21/2021. (KAM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Michael T. Van Der Veen by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Van Der Veen Declaration)(Richie, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Bruce L. Castor, Jr. by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Castor Declaration)(Richie, John)
May 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3844625. (Richie, John)
May 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3844623. (Richie, John)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #9 . Plaintiffs SHALL file their response to Defendants Motion #9 on or before June 1, 2021. Defendant SHALL file its reply on or before June 7, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/20/2021. (KAM)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/20/2021. (KAM)
May 20, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Carson S. Phillips on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Phillips, Carson)
May 20, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Richie on behalf of Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Richie, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 5:21-CV-418 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL- The undersigned hereby recuses himself from this case. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 05/17/2021. (AKD)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Wolfram Research Inc (Snyder, Daniel)
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:21-cv-418-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission; granting #16 Motion for Limited Admission; granting #17 Motion for Limited Admission; granting #18 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on May 11, 2021. (ADH)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Katherine M. OBrien Motion is RIPE 5/11/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel I. Konieczny Motion is RIPE 5/11/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bradford P. Lyerla Motion is RIPE 5/11/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Amie M. Bauer Motion is RIPE 5/11/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3836895 (B4601113269). (Snyder, Daniel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (BJL).
May 11, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3836897 (B4601113271). (Snyder, Daniel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (BJL).
May 11, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3836898 (B4601113272). (Snyder, Daniel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (BJL).
May 11, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3836896 (B4601113270). (Snyder, Daniel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (BJL).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/10/21. (BJL)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/10/21. (BJL)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Wolfram Research Inc re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, #11 MOTION to Seal Certain Declaration Exhibits Notice of Conventional Filing (Snyder, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Certain Declaration Exhibits by Wolfram Research Inc. (Snyder, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Konieczny Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 1 - Jan 27 2021 Webinar and Q&A, #3 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 2 - April 24 2021 email from Gillaspie, #4 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 3 - Webinar_Q&A Transcript, #5 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 4 - BloombergTerminalWolfram Language Documentation, #6 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 5 - Version 12 Launches Today, #7 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 6 - March _ 2016 _ monkeywrench, #8 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 7 - ServiceConnectWolfram Language Documentation, #9 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 8 - Listing of Supported External ServicesWolfram Language Documentation, #10 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 9 - Aug 13 2020 video, # 11 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 10 - Screenshot Comparisons, #12 Affidavit Konieczny Decl Ex 11 - Jennings Wolfram Community Posts, #13 Affidavit Schacht Declaration)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 5/7/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Riley, Kenneth)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #6 Certified Mail Request Service Waived and Deadlines Stipulated by Plaintiff and by Wolfram Research Inc. filed by Wolfram Research Inc (Snyder, Daniel)
March 30, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3808117 (B4601112337). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wolfram Research Inc filed by Cent Holding Company LLC and Cent Capital LLC.(BJL). (Riley, Kenneth) Modified on 3/31/2021 (AHI).
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (Brockwell, Gregory)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC (Brockwell, Gregory)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Brief IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Cent Capital LLC, Cent Holding Company LLC. (BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cent Capital LLC and Cent Holding Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wolfram Research Inc filed by Cent Holding Company LLC and Cent Capital LLC.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cent Holding Company LLC et al v. Wolfram Research Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cent Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E Riley
Represented By: Gregory A Brockwell
Represented By: Bruce Castor
Represented By: Michael van der Veen
Represented By: Carson S. Phillips
Represented By: John Thomas Richie
Represented By: Steven L Nicholas
Represented By: William Earl Bonner
Represented By: Clint L Maze
Represented By: Steve Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cent Capital LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E Riley
Represented By: Gregory A Brockwell
Represented By: Bruce Castor
Represented By: Michael van der Veen
Represented By: Carson S. Phillips
Represented By: John Thomas Richie
Represented By: Steven L Nicholas
Represented By: William Earl Bonner
Represented By: Steve Nicholas
Represented By: Clint L Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfram Research Inc
Represented By: Katherine M O'Brien
Represented By: Amie M Bauer
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Represented By: Bradford P Lyerla
Represented By: Daniel I Konieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?