Hoffman v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Amy Marie Hoffman
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2021cv00639
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3853281. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Amy Marie Hoffman.(BJL). (Ezzell, James)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Court DENIES the #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff has until 6/1/2021 to pay the filing fee as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/10/2021. (AHI)
May 6, 2021 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system.(AHI)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amy Marie Hoffman. (BJL)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Amy Marie Hoffman. (BJL)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Amy Marie Hoffman.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Marie Hoffman
Represented By: Nicholas H Gajewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?