Correct Transmission, LLC v. Adtran, Inc.
Plaintiff: Correct Transmission, LLC
Defendant: Adtran Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00690
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 82 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Correct Transmission, LLC, filed by Adtran Inc.(Sykes, Paul)
June 23, 2021 Filing 81 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Correct Transmission, LLC.(McKinney, Rebekah)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Joshua J. Bennett. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Scott W. Breedlove. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER granting #71 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for E. Leon Carter. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Nathan Cox. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Monica Litle. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Michael C. Pomeroy. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Bradley D. Little. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/18/2021. (KBW)
June 17, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua J. Bennett by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott W. Breedlove by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Leon Carter by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nathan Cox by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Monica Litle by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Michael C. Pomeroy, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah)
June 17, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley D. Little by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Bradley D. Liddle, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Keith McKinney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McKinney, Rebekah)
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3864809 (B4601114079). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865550 (B4601114115). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865547 (B4601114114). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865531 (B4601114110). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865543(B4601114113). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865536 (B4601114111). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 17, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3865540 (B4601114112). (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 6/22/2021 (AHI).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to comply with the requirements detailed in the 5/19/2021 letter by 6/18/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/4/2021. (AHI)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER granting #61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark D. Strachan; David C. Miller and Richard A Sayles terminated. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/3/2021. (KBW)
June 2, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #48 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Correct Transmission, LLC by Adtran Inc.(Wilson, Benn)
June 2, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C Hill on behalf of Adtran Inc (Hill, Jonathan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adtran Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Benn)
May 18, 2021 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00669. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Because Correct Transmission did not adequately plead proper venue for its patent infringement claim under 1400(b), Correct Transmissions patent infringement claim is DISMISSED. Additionally, because the balance of Volkswagen private and public interest factors shows that the Northern District of Alabama is a clearly more convenient venue, ADTRANs Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 58 RESPONSE Defendant Adtran, Inc.'s Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief to #47 Brief by Adtran, Inc.. (Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Correct Transmission, LLC, re #54 MOTION to Strike ADTRAN's Improper Reply Declaration, Related Reply Discussion, and Venue Defense filed by Plaintiff Correct Transmission, LLC (Liddle, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE Plaintiff Correct Transmission, LLC's REPLY Claim Construction Brief to #47 Brief by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Akl, #2 Exhibit Declaration of B. Liddle, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B)(Liddle, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Filing 55 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Adtran, Inc., re #54 MOTION to Strike ADTRAN's Improper Reply Declaration, Related Reply Discussion, and Venue Defense filed by Plaintiff Correct Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Benn C. Wilson, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Benn C. Wilson, #3 Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike ADTRAN's Improper Reply Declaration, Related Reply Discussion, and Venue Defense by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Liddle, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE Defendant Adtran, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief to #47 Brief by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Adtran, Inc., re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueOpposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama filed by Defendant Adtran, Inc. Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 51 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Correct Transmission, LLC, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueOpposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama filed by Defendant Adtran, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Redacted Appendix)(Bennett, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 50 Sealed Document: Response to Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueOpposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama by Correct Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Response) (Bennett, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 49 Certificate of Service re #47 Brief by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Liddle, Bradley) Modified on 3/29/2021 (mc5) to remove Motion (filed erroneously). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Correct Transmission, LLC amending, filed by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 47 BRIEF by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Liddle, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 46 USCA Federal Circuit ORDER denying #2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by ADTRAN, Inc.; granting motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix #8 filed by Petitioner ADTRAN, Inc. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benn C. Wilson for Adtran, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 45 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on March 2, 2021, Proceedings Transcribed: Videoconference Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/2/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2021, (lr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Strachan file on behalf of Benn C. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14562339) by on behalf of Adtran, Inc.. (Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 3/2/2021. Case called for discovery hearing by zoom for this case and companion case 6:20-CV-670. The Court heard discovery issues in both cases and made rulings, order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 3/2/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #14 Motion for Discovery entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The parties have begun venue-related discovery, thus the instant motion is MOOT. The stay is lifted and parties are instructed to submit a new scheduling order with proposed deadlines including a date for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's transfer motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Sykes for Adtran, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Before the Court is the parties Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order (the Motion). The Court finds the Motion is due to be GRANTED and hereby amends the Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. 34) as follows: Parties exchange proposed claim constructions - February 24, 2021 ; Parties disclose extrinsic evidence. The parties shall disclose any extrinsic evidence, including the identity of any expert witness they may rely upon with respect to claim construction or indefiniteness. With respect to any expert identified, the parties shall also provide a summary of the witnesss expected testimony including the opinions to be expressed and a general description of the basis and reasons therefore. A failure to summarize the potential expert testimony in a good faith, informative fashion may result in the exclusion of the proffered testimony. With respect to items of extrinsic evidence, the parties shall identify each such item byproduction number or produce a copy of any such item if not previously produced. - March 10, 2021 ; Deadline to meet and confer to narrow terms in dispute and exchange revised list of terms/constructions. - March 16, 2021 . All other deadlines shall remain as set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order. It is SO ORDERED. Thus, Motion #28 is MOOT. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Strachan filed on behalf of Paul Sykes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14489655) by on behalf of Adtran, Inc.. (Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley David Liddle on behalf of Correct Transmission, LLC. Attorney Bradley David Liddle added to party Correct Transmission, LLC(pty:pla) (Liddle, Bradley) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Adtran, Inc. re #31 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Disposition of Venue Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Adtran, Inc., re #31 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Disposition of Venue Motion filed by Defendant Adtran, Inc. (Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 35 Response Brief to #31 Adtran Inc.'s Motion Stay Pending Dismissal or Transfer by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Cox, Nathan) Modified on 12/21/2020 (mc5). Modified on 12/21/2020 (mc5). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 5/28/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2021, Dispositive/Dauber Motions due by 3/18/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/13/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Motion to Stay (the Motion). Having considered the same, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion to Stay is due on December 21, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Disposition of Venue Motion by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 32 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Correct Transmissions proposed scheduling order, #2 Exhibit B. Adtran's proposed scheduling order)(Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Disposition of Venue Motion by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan I. Cox on behalf of Correct Transmission, LLC. Attorney Nathan I. Cox added to party Correct Transmission, LLC(pty:pla) (Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Updated Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Scheduling Order by Correct Transmission, LLC. (proposed dates are disputed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - CT's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ADTRAN's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Pending before the Court is the parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Agreed. Scheduling Order (the Motion). Having considered the same, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion is hereby GRANTED. The parties deadline to file an Agreed Scheduling Order is November 6, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Scheduling Order by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Nathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10-16-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/19/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021, (kd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING for 5/28/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2020. Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. The Court heard arguments regarding the motion to transfer case - the Court is allowing 1 day (7 hours) of virtual deposition regarding transfer informationonly. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Correct Transmission, LLC, re #14 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff Correct Transmission, LLC (Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance by Correct Transmission, LLC (Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Strachan on behalf of Adtran, Inc.. Attorney Mark D. Strachan added to party Adtran, Inc.(pty:dft) (Strachan, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Adtran, Inc., re #14 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff Correct Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Preliminary Infringement Contentions and for ADTRAN, Inc. to Serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions (the Motion). Having considered the same, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs preliminary infringement contentions are due on October 13, 2020 and ADTRAN, Inc.s preliminary invalidity contentions are due 7 weeks and four days after the case management conference. The Court encourages the parties to work together to submit a joint schedule for the case pursuant to the Courts Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Preliminary Infringement Contentions and for Adtran, Inc. to Serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) Correcting #18 [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Replaced by #19 : Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Preliminary Infringement Contentions by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) Modified on 10/7/2020 (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 10/16/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Case Readiness Notice by Correct Transmission, LLC (Breedlove, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Upon consideration of Plaintiff Correct Transmissions Unopposed Motion toStay Response to ADTRANs Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer to the Northern District of Alabama Pending Resolution of Correct Transmissions Motion for Venue Discovery, the Court is of the opinion that the motion should be granted.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that motion is GRANTED, CorrectTransmissions deadline to respond to ADTRANs Motion to Dismiss or Transfer(Dkt. #10) is hereby STAYED until further notice from the court.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Response to Adtran's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer to the Northern District of Alabama Pending Resolution of Correct Transmission's Motion for Venue Discovery by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Upon consideration of Plaintiff Correct Transmissions Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Adtrans Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or to Transfer to the Northern District of Alabama. IT IS ORDERED that motion is GRANTED, and the new response date for Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss or Transfer is October 12, 2020.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueOpposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Litle on behalf of Correct Transmission, LLC (Litle, Monica) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C. Miller on behalf of Adtran, Inc.. Attorney David C. Miller added to party Adtran, Inc.(pty:dft) (Miller, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Alabama by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael K. Foliano, #2 Affidavit of Richard A. Sayles, #3 Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard) Plf's Response deadline stayed pending ruling on #14 per Text Order dated 10/2/2020 (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Adtran, Inc. answer due 9/14/2020. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 14, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Adtran, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sayles, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Correct Transmission, LLC. Adtran, Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Adtran, Inc. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Correct Transmission, LLC. Adtran, Inc. (Carter, E.) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/24/2020) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Bradley D. Liddle and Monica Litle. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13792443), filed by Correct Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 669 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 523 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - 465 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - 928 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - 150 Patent, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, E.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correct Transmission, LLC v. Adtran, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adtran Inc
Represented By: Benn Charles Wilson
Represented By: Paul M Sykes
Represented By: Mark D. Strachan
Represented By: Richard A Sayles
Represented By: David C. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan C Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Correct Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Nathan I. Cox
Represented By: E Leon Carter
Represented By: Scott W. Breedlove
Represented By: Monica Litle
Represented By: Joshua J. Bennett
Represented By: Minghui Yang
Represented By: Bradley David Liddle
Represented By: Michael C Pomeroy
Represented By: Monica Frances Litle
Represented By: Joshua James Bennett
Represented By: Nathan I Cox
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Scott W Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?