Neal v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Neal
Defendant: Crestwood Healthcare LP doing business as Crestwood Medical Center, Charles D. Hooper, Emergency Medical Associates Inc, Dianna G. Osborn, Ivan E. Mader, Prem Kumar Gulati, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Jason M. Berman, Daniella Pitt, Laurie L. Odland and Melody R. Bilstein
Case Number: 5:2021cv00713
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 28 Alias Summons Issued as to Laurie L. Odland by Clerk and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
July 15, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crestwood Healthcare LP. filed by Crestwood Healthcare LP (Collins, Philip)
July 9, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emergency Medical Associates Inc. filed by Emergency Medical Associates Inc (Beasley, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dianna G. Osborn. filed by Dianna G. Osborn (Beasley, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jason M. Berman. filed by Jason M. Berman (Beasley, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources Inc. filed by Wexford Health Sources Inc (Piggott, Philip)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melody R. Bilstein. filed by Melody R. Bilstein (Piggott, Philip)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles D. Hooper. filed by Charles D. Hooper (Piggott, Philip)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prem Kumar Gulati. filed by Prem Kumar Gulati (Piggott, Philip)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason M. Berman, Emergency Medical Associates Inc, Dianna G. Osborn.(Beasley, Daniel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charles D. Hooper.(Piggott, Philip)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prem Kumar Gulati.(Piggott, Philip)
June 22, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Melody R. Bilstein.(Piggott, Philip)
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wexford Health Sources Inc.(Piggott, Philip)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 Daniella Pitt, RN ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daniella Pitt.(Collins, Philip)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 Crestwood Healthcare, L.P d/b/a Crestwood Medical Center ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crestwood Healthcare LP.(Collins, Philip)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Based upon Defendants' representations, the court STRIKES their June 14, 2021, Motion to Dismiss. The court further RESCINDS its June 15, 2021, orders, (docs. 8, 9, & 10), which it issued based upon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/16/21. (BJL)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #6 MOTION to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 6/15/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jason M. Berman, Dianna G. Osborn. (Beasley, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than July 29, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/15/21. (BJL)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, July 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/15/21. (BJL)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file response to Motion to Dismiss within 14 days. Defendants may reply 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/15/21. (BJL)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Beasley, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason M. Berman, Dianna G. Osborn. (Beasley, Daniel)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Neal. Crestwood Healthcare LP served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021; Wexford Health Sources Inc served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (BJL)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Neal. Jason M. Berman served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021; Melody R. Bilstein served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/19/2021; Prem Kumar Gulati served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/19/2021; Charles D. Hooper served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/19/2021; Dianna G. Osborn served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/19/2021; Daniella Pitt served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (BJL)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason M. Berman, Melody R. Bilstein, Crestwood Healthcare LP, Emergency Medical Associates Inc, Prem Kumar Gulati, Charles D. Hooper, Ivan E. Mader, Laurie L. Odland, Dianna G. Osborn, Daniella Pitt, and Wexford Health Sources Inc. by Clerk and given to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
May 26, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601113586 (BJL)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (AHI)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Patrick Neal.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Wexford Health Sources Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestwood Healthcare LP doing business as Crestwood Medical Center
Represented By: Philip R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Hooper
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Medical Associates Inc
Represented By: Daniel F Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna G. Osborn
Represented By: Andrew Mark Townsley
Represented By: Daniel F Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan E. Mader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prem Kumar Gulati
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M. Berman
Represented By: Andrew Mark Townsley
Represented By: Daniel F Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniella Pitt
Represented By: Philip R Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie L. Odland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody R. Bilstein
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Neal
Represented By: Bruce J Downey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?