Brown v. Limestone County, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Steven F. Brown
Defendant: Limestone County, Alabama, Tennessee Valley Authority, Suzanne A. Baucom, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley and Joshua M. Magnusson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00917
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 1, #2 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 2, #3 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 3, #4 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 4, #5 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 5, #6 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 6, #7 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 7, #8 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 8, #9 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 9, #10 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 10, #11 Affidavit of Plaintiff with Exhibits - Part 11)(Howison, James)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Suzanne A. Baucom, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Suzanne A. Baucom, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley. (Evans, Jesse) Modified on 9/2/2021 (AHI).
September 1, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to re #10 , #19 REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Suzanne A. Baucom, Limestone County, Alabama, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, Tennessee Valley Authority, James R. Worley. (Evans, Jesse)
August 30, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Suzanne A. Baucom, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley. (Evans, Jesse)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/30/2021. (AHI)
August 11, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steven F. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Limestone County Commission Meeting Minutes, #2 Exhibit "B" Deed to Steven F. Bown, #3 Exhibit "C" Deed to David Bruce Brown Jr., #4 Exhibit "D" Covenants and Restrictions for Riverside Acres SD, #5 Exhibit "E" Attorney General Opinion)(Howison, James)
August 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2021; James Howison present for plaintiff; Mark Maclin present for dft Limestone Co AL; David Ayliffe and James Chase present for TVA; Jesse Evans, III present for dfts Suzanne Baucom, Daniel Snare, James Worley, and Joshua Magnusson; The parties discussed the pending motions and indicated that responses would be filed. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (SPT, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Tennessee Valley Authority Without Prejudice by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chase, James)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss - Plaintiff's Brief in Response and Opposition to Tennessee Valley Authority's Motion to Dismiss filed by Steven F. Brown. (Howison, James)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven F. Brown. (Howison, James)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 8/4/2021 at 11:00 a.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel prior to hearing. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/23/21. (SPT )
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:21-cv-917-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 8/13/21 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/19/21. (BJL)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER: the Clerk may not assign any civil case to a magistrate judge in which a party seeks a temporary restraining order or other emergency relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/19/21. (BJL)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , as Amended, by Limestone County, Alabama.(Maclin, T)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Suzanne A. Baucom, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Evans, Jesse)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by T Mark Maclin on behalf of Limestone County, Alabama (Maclin, T)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 30, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/14/21. (BJL)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/14/21. (BJL) Modified on 7/19/2021 (BJL).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff to respond to Motion to Dismiss withint 14 days; Defendant may reply 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/14/21. (BJL)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse P Evans, III on behalf of Suzanne A. Baucom, Joshua M. Magnusson, Daniel M. Snare, James R. Worley (Evans, Jesse)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tennessee Valley Authority from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-CV-2021-900127. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Limestone County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. Brown
Represented By: James R Howison
Represented By: James Russell Howison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limestone County, Alabama
Represented By: T Mark Maclin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: David D Ayliffe
Represented By: James S Chase
Represented By: Sydney Dawn Nenni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne A. Baucom
Represented By: Jesse P Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Snare
Represented By: Jesse P Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Worley
Represented By: Jesse P Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua M. Magnusson
Represented By: Jesse P Evans, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?