Watkins v. Austin
Plaintiff: Brittany Watkins
Defendant: Lloyd Austin, U.S. Attorney Prim F. Escalona and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 5:2021cv01049
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Watkins. Lloyd Austin served on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Gill, Patricia)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Watkins. Merrick Garland served on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Gill, Patricia)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Watkins. Prim F. Escalona served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Gill, Patricia)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lloyd Austin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
August 1, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3895487 (ALND receipt# B4601114935). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lloyd Austin, filed by Brittany Watkins.(AKD). (Gill, Patricia) Modified on 8/2/2021 (AKD).
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brittany Watkins (AKD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lloyd Austin, filed by Brittany Watkins.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Watkins
Represented By: Patricia A Gill
Represented By: Sterling L DeRamus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Prim F. Escalona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?