Johnson et al v. Redstone Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Johnson and George Johnson, III
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union, Danny Adcock and Heath Emerson
Case Number: 5:2022cv01504
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 21 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Gloria Johnson and George Johnson, III. (DNW)
January 24, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File, #14 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Cummins, Timothy)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Redstone Federal Credit Union's Motion to Stay Initial Disclosures and Discovery until the Court resolves the pending motion to dismiss. (Doc. #7 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/19/2023. (DNW)
January 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION Plaintiff Notice of Filing Proposed Sur-response To Defendant Redstone Federal Credit Union's Reply by Gloria Johnson and George Johnson, III. (Attachments: #1 exh. 1)(DNW)
January 18, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions by Danny Adcock, Heath Emerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiffs)(Rodgers, Robert)
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File to File Surresponse by Gloria Johnson, George Johnson, III. (DNW)
January 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 11(b) Condition Precedent Letter by Gloria Johnson and George Johnson, III (DNW)
January 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response to Defendant Redstone Federal Credit Union's Reply by Gloria Johnson, George Johnson, III. (KSS)
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Rule 11(b) Condition Precedent Letter by Gloria Johnson, George Johnson, III. (KSS)
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Cummins, Timothy)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 Plaintiff Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Gloria Johnson, George Johnson, III. (DNW)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Heath Emerson. No signature and date of execution. (DNW)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Danny Adcock, Heath Emerson. (Rodgers, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redstone Federal Credit Union. filed by Redstone Federal Credit Union (Cummins, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Initial Disclosures and Discovery by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Cummins, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 Brief re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Johnson v Redstone Federal Credit Union No 5:14-cv-2378-MHH: Doc.48, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: In re Johnson: Bankruptcy Case 98-81356-CRJ-7: Doc 62)(Cummins, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Cummins, Timothy)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Redstone Federal Credit Union served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022. (DNW)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants via certified mail. (DNW)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Gloria Johnson. (DNW)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gloria Johnson and George Johnson, III. (Attachments: #1 exh. 1, #2 exh. 2, #3 exh. 3, #4 exh. 4)(DNW)
November 29, 2022 Filing fee:$ 402.00, receipt number H-117 (DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Redstone Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Timothy P Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Adcock
Represented By: Robert Vandiver Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Emerson
Represented By: Robert Vandiver Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?