Mausehund v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Tanya Lynn Mausehund
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2022cv01523
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Social Security Administration, Commissioner. (Rogers, Kristin)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Marie Rogers on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Rogers, Kristin)
January 23, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, ALND receipt number B-3367 (SRD)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Plaintiff Tanya Lynn Mausehund filed this case on December 1, 2022 but has yet to pay the filing fee or move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. So the court ORDERS Mausehund to either move for in forma pauperis status or pay a total of $402 ($350 filing fee + $52 administrative fee) to the Clerk of Court on or before February 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/18/2023. (SRD)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B Hood on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Hood, Jack)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Choi on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Choi, Sarah)
December 2, 2022 Set Deadlines: Social Security Administration, Commissioner answer due 2/1/2023. (KAM)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Tanya Lynn Mausehund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mausehund v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lynn Mausehund
Represented By: Lisa Marie Ivey
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Represented By: Kristin Marie Rogers
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?