SA&H Alabama Holding LLC et al v. Shoemaker
Plaintiff: SA&H Alabama Holding LLC and Southern HVAC Corporation
Defendant: Michael Scott Shoemaker, Gerald Rollo and One Source Heating, Cooling and Electrical, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv01519
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Scott Shoemaker, Gerald Rollo, One Source Heating, Cooling and Electrical, LLC, filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement (Shoemaker), #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement (Rollo), #3 Exhibit C - 10/5/23 Letter to Rollo, #4 Exhibit D - 10/6/23 Letter to Shoemaker, #5 Exhibit E - 10/6/23 Letter to One Source, #6 Exhibit F - 10/6/23 Email from Dawsey, #7 Exhibit G - 10/16/23 Email from Brown to Dawsey)(Clark, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 43 Brief re 38 Order, on inapplicability of Pitney Bowes. (Clark, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 42 Brief on Pitney Bowes by Defendant. (Knight, Sam)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: This action is SET for Mediation on 1/5/2024 at 1:00 PM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. By 1/3/2024 parties shall submit a confidential mediation statement to Judge Borden's chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/22/2023. (AHI)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER: The clerk referred this case to Magistrate Judge Borden to conduct mediation by January 19, 2024, as ordered by the court. Doc. 39. The parties are DIRECTED to jointly contact chambers by the end of business tomorrow, December 22, 2023, via email (borden_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov), and provide three dates on which counsel and a representative for each party with full settlement authority may be available for mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/21/2023. (SUH)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to refer this case to a United States Magistrate Judge to hold a settlement conference. The parties shall conduct the settlement conference by 1/19/2024. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/20/2023. (AHI)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file a brief discussing Pitney Bowes, Inc. v. Berney Off. Sols., 823 So. 2d 659 (Ala. 2001), and its application to this case by December 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/19/2023. (AHI)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER that the Court GRANTS the #29 Motion for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/19/23. (SPT )
December 19, 2023 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION For Settlement Conference filed by Michael Scott Shoemaker. (Knight, Sam)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference regarding the #29 MOTION For Settlement Conference filed by Michael Scott Shoemaker is set for 11:30 a.m. CST on Tuesday, 12/19/23; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/19/23. (SPT )
December 19, 2023 Filing 34 Opposition to re #29 filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Clark, John)
December 19, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2023; John Clarke present for plaintiffs; Sam David Knight present for defendant. (SPT )
December 18, 2023 Filing 33 Plaintiff Exhibit List of Motion Hearing held 12/12/23 by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PX Exhibit 1 Filed Under Seal, #2 PX Exhibit 2, #3 PX Exhibit 3, #4 PX Exhibit 4, #5 PX Exhibit 5 Filed Under Seal, #6 PX Exhibit 6, #7 PX Exhibit 7, #8 PX Exhibit 8, #9 PX Exhibit 9, #10 PX Exhibit 10, #11 PX Exhibit 11, #12 PX Exhibit 12, #13 PX Exhibit 13, #14 PX Exhibit 14)(SPT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2023: #15 Sealed Exhibit, #16 Sealed Exhibit Part 1, #17 Sealed Exhibit Part 2) (SPT, ).
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference regarding the #29 MOTION For Settlement Conference filed by Michael Scott Shoemaker is set for 1:30 p.m. on Monday, 12/18/23; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/18/23. (SPT )
December 18, 2023 Filing 31 Defendant Exhibit List of Motion Hearing held 12/12/23 by Michael Scott Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 DX Exhibit 1, #2 DX Exhibit 2, #3 DX Exhibit 3)(SPT )
December 18, 2023 Filing 30 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/12/2023, before Judge Judge Liles C. Burke. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christina Decker. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2024. (LCB)
December 18, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION For Settlement Conference by Michael Scott Shoemaker. (Knight, Sam)
December 18, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference on 12/18/2023 not held. (SPT )
December 12, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2023; John Clark, IV present for plaintiffs; Sam David Knight present for defendant; Cross and Direct of Witnesses; Exhibits ID'd and Admitted; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (SPT )
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: The Court GRANTS the joint motion for entry of a Protective Order and certain documents and information shall remain confidential as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/11/2023. (AHI)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting Matthew T. Brown #24 Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/11/23. (SPT )
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting Robert O. Sheridan #23 Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/11/23. (SPT )
December 8, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Scott Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 MSS Dec, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 SHVAC_00155, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 SHVAC_00156, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 Def Responses to Rogs, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Map, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 SHVAC_00060, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 RT Dec, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Service Titan, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 Plf's Resp to Rogs, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 Gerstman Dec)(Knight, Sam)
December 8, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Brown by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clark, John)
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert O. Sheridan by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clark, John)
December 8, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4485380 (B-8959). (Clark, John)
December 8, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4485377 (B-8958). (Clark, John)
December 7, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation for Protective Order)(Clark, John)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs #18 Motion for Expedited Discovery to the extent set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/28/23. (SPT )
November 28, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference regarding the Motion to Expedite Discovery #18 held on 11/28/2023; John Clark present for plaintiffs; Sam Knight and Christopher Driver present for defendant. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (SPT )
November 27, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Michael Scott Shoemaker. (Knight, Sam)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference regarding the #18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation is set for 9:30 a.m. on Tuesday, 11/28/23; dial in information will be emailed to counsel prior to call. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/27/23. (SPT )
November 27, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Clark, John)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER that a Motion Hearing regarding the #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order is set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, 12/12/23, in the Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/21/23. (SPT)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/21/23. (SPT )
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Clark, John) Modified on 11/21/2023 (SPT, ).
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. Michael Scott Shoemaker waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Clark, John)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern HVAC Corporation. filed by Southern HVAC Corporation (Clark, John)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC. filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC (Clark, John)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B Driver on behalf of Michael Scott Shoemaker (Driver, Christopher)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam David Knight on behalf of All Defendants (Knight, Sam)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued by clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Michael Scott Shoemaker. (AHI)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court CANCELS the TRO Hearing set for 11/15/2023 and it will be reset by further order and MOOTS the #7 MOTION to clarify Court's order (Doc. #6) regarding TRO hearing. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/14/2023. (AHI)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to clarify Court's order (Doc. #6) regarding TRO hearing by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Clark, John)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This matter is set for a hearing on the plaintiffs' Motion for a TRO on 11/15/2023 at 1:30 PM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Liles C Burke. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/13/2023. (AHI)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Reassignment: This action is reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke, please use case number 5:23-cv-01519-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to case (LCB)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2023. (LCB)
November 10, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Brinker, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Brinker (Employment Agmt), #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of J. Brinker (3/1/23 Email by Shoemaker), #4 Affidavit Declaration of M. Brown, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of M. Brown (One Source Website), #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of M. Brown (10/6/23 LT to Shoemaker), #7 Exhibit C to Declaration of M. Brown (10/17/23 Shoemaker Email), #8 Exhibit D to Declaration of M. Brown (10/6/23 LT to One Source), #9 Exhibit E to Declaration of M. Brown (10/6/23 Email from M. Dawsey), #10 Exhibit F to Declaration of M. Brown (10/16/23 Email from M. Brown))(Clark, John)
November 10, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4467331 (B-8454). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Michael Scott Shoemaker, filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation.(LCB). (Clark, John)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial. (LCB)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Scott Shoemaker, filed by SA&H Alabama Holding LLC, Southern HVAC Corporation.(LCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SA&H Alabama Holding LLC et al v. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SA&H Alabama Holding LLC
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Represented By: Matthew T Brown
Represented By: Robert O Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern HVAC Corporation
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Represented By: Matthew T Brown
Represented By: Robert O Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Shoemaker
Represented By: Sam David Knight
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Source Heating, Cooling and Electrical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?