Millan et al v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alejandro Millan and Leah Millian
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2023cv01523
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #19 Motion to Stay all Future deadlines and all deadlines are STAYED until 3/3/2024. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/4/2024. (AHI)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Jones, Allan)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/28/2023. (AHI)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE LILES C. BURKE. Please use case number 5:23-cv-1523-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (AHI)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the HONORABLE C. LYNWOOD SMITH JR. Please use case number 5:23-cv-1523-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to this case. (LCB)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Jones, Allan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Allan)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Jones, Allan)
December 14, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/14/2023. (SHB)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant shall file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) days of the entry date of this order. Plaintiff shall file any reply within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/13/2023. (LCB)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alejandro Millan, Leah Millian. (Weston, Christopher)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand Motion is RIPE 12/7/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Jones, Allan)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant shall file a response to the motion #8 within four (4) days of the entry date of this order. Plaintiffs shall file any reply within three (3) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/8/2023. (LCB)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand Motion is RIPE 12/7/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Alejandro Millan, Leah Millian. (Weston, Christopher)
November 15, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number (B-8521) (LCB)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Regarding Compliance with Rule 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2023. (LCB)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for December 14, 2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Call in information will be provided to the parties separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2023. (LCB)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than December 26, 2023; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after December 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2023. (LCB)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company. filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Jones, Allan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Jones, Allan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial.(LCB)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number 47-CV-2023-901201., filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millan et al v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Millan
Represented By: Christopher William Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Millian
Represented By: Christopher William Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Allan S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?