McKinney v. Principal Financial Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Defendant: Principal Financial Services Inc, Principal Securities Inc and Principal Life Insurance Company Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv01578
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eri - Petition for removal - E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER; The court ORDERS Defendants to respond to the motion within 14 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may file a reply within 7 days of Defendants' response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/8/2024. (LCB)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Rebekah Keith McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court GRANTS #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to the motion to dismiss by January 19, 2024. Defendants shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/4/2024. (LCB)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA #3 Motion is RIPE 1/4/2024. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Rebekah Keith McKinney. (Ragsdale, Barry)
January 3, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/3/2024. (SHB)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and plaintiff's Response is due by 1/12/2024 and any replies are due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/6/2023. (AHI)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order, Motion is RIPE 12/5/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Rebekah Keith McKinney. (Ragsdale, Barry)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court RESCINDS (doc. 6) and SETS a Telephone Status Conference for 1/3/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr.The Court will provide the call-in information to the parties separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/30/2023. (LCB)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court RESCINDS (doc. 5) and ORDERS the parties to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than January 16, 2024; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after January 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/30/2023. (LCB)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for 2/12/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Call-in information will be provided to the parties separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (LCB)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than February 26, 2024; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after February 26, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (LCB)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss (doc. 3) within fourteen (14) days of the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (LCB)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA by Principal Financial Services Inc, Principal Life Insurance Company Inc, Principal Securities Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Brief in Support)(Wahlheim, William)
November 22, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4475197 (B-8684). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County Alabama, case number 47-CV-2023-901267 filed by All Defendants with a JURY DEMAND contained within the body of the Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Wahlheim, William) Modified on 11/22/2023 (AHI).
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County Alabama, case number 47-CV-2023-901267 filed by All Defendants with a JURY DEMAND contained within the body of the Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit B)(AHI)
November 21, 2023 *** Complaint with jury demand filed in State Court as document 2 on 10/23/2023 and Amended Complaint with jury demand filed in State Court as document 9 on 11/8/2023 (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Principal Financial Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Represented By: Barry A Ragsdale
Represented By: Robert Smith Vance, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Braxton Scott Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Securities Inc
Represented By: Braxton Scott Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Braxton Scott Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?