Moss v. McClain et al
Petitioner: Scotty Dale Moss
Respondent: Antonio McClain and Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Case Number: 5:2023cv01600
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay and/or for a Continuance by Scotty Dale Moss. (AHI) (AHI, ).
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Slate Poe on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, Antonio McClain (Poe, Beth)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The respondents are ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 30 days why the petition should not be granted. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide the respondents and the Attorney General of the State of Alabama a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus along with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/5/2024. (LCB)
December 22, 2023 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number H-413 (AHI)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DENIES #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court finds the petitioner can afford to pay the $5 filing fee. If petitioner wishes to continue, he must forward payment to the Clerk of Court within 30 days by check or money order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/5/2023. (LCB)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of exhibits by Scotty Dale Moss re #1 in support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (LCB)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re Case Number (AKD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scotty Dale Moss. (AKD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Scotty Dale Moss.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. McClain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scotty Dale Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antonio McClain
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?