Silva et al v. Dale et al
Plaintiff: Leone Silva, Ernesto Anacleto, Jose Hernandez, Eduar Sauceda-Nunez, Martin Ramon and Angel Martinez
Defendant: RD and S Communications Resources LLC, Graycliff Enterprises Inc and Robert Dale
Case Number: 6:2019cv00135
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant, Graycliff Enterprises Inc., Motion to Dismiss Count VI. #12 Graycliff's Motion #12 is DENIED with leave to refile the grounds for dismissal at the summary judgment stage. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/22/2019. (PSM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count VI by Graycliff Enterprises Inc. (Starling, M)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to RD and S Communications Resources LLC- Return to Sender, unable to forward. (KWC)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Robert Dale - Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward. (KWC)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Graycliff has an additional 15 days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on February 21, 2019. (EBV)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (CORRECTED) by Graycliff Enterprises Inc. (Starling, M)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/21/2019. (PSM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Graycliff Enterprises Inc. (Starling, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Graycliff Enterprises Inc served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (KWC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert Dale, Graycliff Enterprises Inc, RD and S Communications Resources LLC. issued mailed certified mail (TLM, )
January 31, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601095060. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Robert Dale, Graycliff Enterprises Inc, RD and S Communications Resources LLC, filed by Jose Hernandez, Angel Martinez, Eduar Sauceda-Nunez, Leone Silva, Martin Ramon, Ernesto Anacleto.(PSM). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 1/31/2019 (TLM, ).
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ernesto Anacleto, Jose Hernandez, Angel Martinez, Martin Ramon, Eduar Sauceda-Nunez, Leone Silva. (PSM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Ernesto Anacleto, Jose Hernandez, Angel Martinez, Martin Ramon, Eduar Sauceda-Nunez, Leone Silva (Attachments: #1 Hernandez, #2 Martinez, #3 Ramon, #4 Sacedo-Nunez, #5 Silva)(PSM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Dale, Graycliff Enterprises Inc, RD and S Communications Resources LLC, filed by Jose Hernandez, Angel Martinez, Eduar Sauceda-Nunez, Leone Silva, Martin Ramon, Ernesto Anacleto.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva et al v. Dale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leone Silva
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Anacleto
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduar Sauceda-Nunez
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ramon
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Martinez
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD and S Communications Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graycliff Enterprises Inc
Represented By: M Jefferson Starling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?