Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc v. Action Jasper LLC
Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc
Defendant: Action Jasper LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00884
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc.(Yelling, Tamula)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/3/2019. (PSM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc by Action Jasper LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barley, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail) as to Action Jasper LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (KWC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Action Jasper LLC- mailed certified mail. (KWC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc. (Yelling, Tamula)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc.(Yelling, Tamula)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 6/12/2019. (TLM2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc. (Yelling, Tamula)
June 10, 2019 Filing fee received from Tamula R Yelling in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number B4601098311. (KWC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Jasper LLC, filed by Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc v. Action Jasper LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: Tamula R Yelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Jasper LLC
Represented By: Matthew A Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?