Watts v. Cascade Receivables Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chad Watts
Defendant: Cascade Receivables Management LLC, Cascade Capital LLC Series B and Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01024
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC of Settlement (Leeth, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC.(Crum, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC. filed by Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC (Leeth, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC.(Leeth, Alan)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/29/2019. (TLM2)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC. (Crum, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cascade Receivables Management, LLC and Cascade Capital, LLC Series B answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/25/2019. (TLM2)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/23/2019. (PSM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC. (Leeth, Alan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Watts. Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (JLC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Watts. Cascade Receivables Management LLC served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (JLC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Watts. Cascade Capital LLC Series B served but date of delivery left blank. (JLC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cascade Capital, LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management, LLC and Trinity Emergency Physicians, LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 2nd day of July, 2019. (JLC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Chad Watts. (Seals, W)
July 1, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3381756, NDAL receipt #B4601098766. (Seals, W) Modified on 7/1/2019 (JLC).
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cascade Capital LLC Series B, Cascade Receivables Management LLC, Trinity Emergency Physicians LLCC, filed by Chad Watts.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Cascade Receivables Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Watts
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Receivables Management LLC
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital LLC Series B
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Emergency Physicians LLC
Represented By: Richard E Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?