Bowling et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Amy Bowling and Charlie Bowling
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01311
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Watters, Latanishia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hughes, C)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Watters, Latanishia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Watters, Latanishia)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Watters, Latanishia)
August 21, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3416704, NDAL receipt #B4601100035. (Watters, Latanishia) Modified on 8/21/2019 (JLC).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/15/2019. (PSM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Fayette County, case number 32-cv-2019-900043., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bowling
Represented By: John V Martine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Bowling
Represented By: John V Martine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Latanishia D Watters
Represented By: Joseph L Cowan, II
Represented By: C Dennis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?