Edgil v. Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC
Plaintiff: Tanya Edgil
Defendant: Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01350
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Plaintiff's counsel has reported to the Court that a settlement has been reached in this matter. (See #11 ) Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any party may, for good cause shown, reopen this action within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/30/2019. (PSM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Tanya Edgil (Philipps, David) Modified on 9/27/2019 (JLC).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 9/13/2019. (LAS2)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/12/2019. (PSM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC. (Friedman, Rachel)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 9/3/2019. (LAS2)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Edgil. Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (JLC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Tanya Edgil (Sykstus, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Mary E. Philipps in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3416006, NDAL receipt #B4601100026. (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/20/2019 (JLC).
August 20, 2019 PHV Fee paid for David J. Philipps in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3416004, NDAL receipt #B460110225. (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/20/2019 (JLC).
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3415990, NDAL receipt #B46010100024. (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/20/2019 (JLC).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps, by Tanya Edgil. (PSM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tanya Edgil. (PSM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC, filed by Tanya Edgil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgil v. Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Edgil
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balanced Healthcare Receivables LLC
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?