Goodson v. Poe et al
Plaintiff: Whitley Goodson
Defendant: Deborah Johnson, Gilbert Jean, JC Poe, Jr, Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Dr Marcus O'Mary and Roger Wilson
Case Number: 6:2019cv01399
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 Dr. Marcus O'Mary, Roger Wilson and Gilbert Jean's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gilbert Jean.(Donahue, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 J.C. Poe, Jr., and Deborah Johnson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JC Poe, Jr.(Donahue, Timothy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to AMIC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Whitley Goodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation's Motion to Dismiss. #6 Plaintiff has ten (10) days from the date ofthis Order to respond to the Motion. AIMC will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/23/2019. (PSM)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/19/2019. (PSM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Speagle on behalf of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation (Speagle, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitley Goodson. Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (JLC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly S DeShazo on behalf of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation (DeShazo, Kimberly)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitley Goodson. Deborah Johnson served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; JC Poe, Jr served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (KAM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Deborah Johnson, JC Poe, Jr. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gilbert Jean, Marcus O'Mary, Roger Wilson. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Whitley Goodson. (Allen, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3432779. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Gilbert Jean, Deborah Johnson, Marcus O'Mary, JC Poe, Jr, Roger Wilson, filed by Whitley Goodson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6, part 1, # 7 Attachment 6, part 2)(KEK). (Allen, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Gilbert Jean, Deborah Johnson, Marcus O'Mary, JC Poe, Jr, Roger Wilson, filed by Whitley Goodson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, part 1, #7 Attachment 6, part 2)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson v. Poe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitley Goodson
Represented By: Michele Elaine Pate
Represented By: James Franklin Ozment
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Jean
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Poe, Jr
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott M Speagle
Represented By: Kimberly S DeShazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Marcus O'Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?