Martin v. Sheriff of Walker County et al
Plaintiff: Terry Martin
Defendant: James E Underwood, Richard Calloway, Sheriff of Walker County, Laura Tirey, Walker County, Alabama and Phillip Robinson
Case Number: 6:2019cv01534
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Sheriff of Walker County, Laura Tirey, James E Underwood. (Clements, Fred)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Walker County, Alabama. (Clements, Fred)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 10/21/2019. (LAS2)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26 Conference Deadline by Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Sheriff of Walker County, Laura Tirey, James E Underwood, Walker County, Alabama. (McNeill, J)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Walker County filed by Terry Martin. (Diamond, Seth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Calloway, Robinson and Tirey filed by Terry Martin. (Diamond, Seth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Underwood filed by Terry Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ACCA Liability Fund, #2 Exhibit B - About ACCA)(Diamond, Seth)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Before this Court is Defendant Walker Countys Motion to Dismiss #3 and Defendants James E. Underwood, Richard Calloway, Laura Tirey, and Phillip Robinsons Motion to Dismiss #5 ; Plaintiff has fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions; Defendants shall thereafter have ten (10) days to file each reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/27/2019. (KAM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Brief re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Sheriff of Walker County, Laura Tirey, James E Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Martin Indictment, #2 Exhibit Murray Indictment)(Clements, Fred)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Sheriff of Walker County, Laura Tirey, James E Underwood. (Clements, Fred)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Walker County, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Martin Indictment, #2 Exhibit Murray Indictment)(Clements, Fred)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Walker County, Alabama. (Clements, Fred)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/16/2019. (PSM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sheriff of Walker County, James E Underwood, Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Laura Tirey, Walker County, Alabama from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 64-cv-2019-900302., filed by Sheriff of Walker County, James E Underwood, Richard Calloway, Phillip Robinson, Laura Tirey, Walker County, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Case Action Summary)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Sheriff of Walker County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Underwood
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Calloway
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Walker County
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Tirey
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County, Alabama
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Robinson
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Martin
Represented By: Charles Clyde Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Seth L Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?