Tidwell v. Chevron Mining Inc
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Tidwell
Defendant: Chevron Mining Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02011
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 9/25/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/17/20. (MRR, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/17/20. (MRR, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: As the parties have unanimously consented to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate judge, the consent conference scheduled for February 4, 2020 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/17/2020. (RCP)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paisley Anne Newsome on behalf of Debra Ann Tidwell (Newsome, Paisley)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/7/20. (MRR, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 20, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 20, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on February 4, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 1/7/20. (MRR, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Mining Inc. filed by Chevron Mining Inc (Hargrove, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chevron Mining Inc.(Hargrove, John)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chevron Mining Inc served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (MRR, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chevron Mining Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
December 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601102696 (MRR, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Debra Ann Tidwell. (MRR, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chevron Mining Inc, filed by Debra Ann Tidwell.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Chevron Mining Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Mining Inc
Represented By: John W Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Tidwell
Represented By: John R Jacobs
Represented By: Paisley Anne Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?