Select Portfolio Servicing Inc v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Defendant: Jayakrishna Gundavelli, Internal Revenue Service and Jennifer Dawn Burleson Batchelor
Case Number: 6:2020cv00373
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc as to Jayakrishna Gundavelli. (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc Certificate of Summons to United States of America, Internal Revenue Service pursuant to Rule 4(i) Fed. R. Civ. P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Summons to Attorney General of the United States, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Summons to U.S. Attorney (N.D. Ala.), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Summons to Internal Revenue Service)(Steindorff, Gilbert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Dawn Burleson Batchelor, Jayakrishna Gundavelli, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Steindorff, Gilbert)
March 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3561118 (B4601104953). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(MRR, ). (Steindorff, Amelia) Modified on 3/23/2020 (MRR, ).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayakrishna Gundavelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Dawn Burleson Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Gilbert C Steindorff, IV
Represented By: Amelia Killebrew Steindorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?