Bankhead et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Randal Childers, Stanley Dixon, Paula Cook, Chris Pugh, Crystal Crumpton, Melissa Brown, Rosyln Bankhead, Danny Bankhead, Clint Cook, Kernisha Clay, Doris Blanton, Charles Sanford, Deborah Coleman, Cheryl Tucker, Eric McQuirter, Jeremy Windham, Crea Howard, Alfred Hoskins, Jr, Diane Hubbard, Bobby Tucker, Larry Johnson, Deborah Lewis, Robert Nash, Jerimiah Howze, Keleka Mitchell, Marshall Speer, Antonio Howze, Justice Turner, Renae Shanklin, Brandi Softly, Staci Sudduth, Jessica Rivera, Ray Madison, De-Markus Tucker, Margaret Kimbrell, James Odom, Cherie Weiderholt, Stevie Johnson, Julie Duncan, Anquaneida Thomas, Jerry Hill, Ella Horton, Veronica Smith, Resasha Steward, Erica Davis, Melba Nash, Hosie Franks, Secunda Kidd, Jerome Howard, Delta, Sadie Dixon, Debra Reel, Anton Tucker, James Smith, Jr, Shaneeka Evans, Estelle Jackson, Kim Smith, Willie Mae Banks, Florine Lucas, Rachel Softly, Lilly Madison, Robert Duncan, Clayton Shanklin, Gary Dixon, George Horton, Clinton Cook, Quinton Jackon, Thomas Softly, Belinda Walker, Paula Odom, Patricia Cook White, Barbara Sherer, Albert Lewis, Carrington Steward, Traci Hubbert, Sr and Debra Davis
Defendant: Big Sky Environmental LLC, Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc and Big Sky Hauling LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00690
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER As more thoroughly stated within, Big Sky is hereby ORDERED to file a brief explaining how the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 by 5:00 PM on Wednesday, July 22, 2020. If Plaintiffs contend that the amount in controversy does not exceed $75,000, Plaintiffs shall have until 5:00 PM on Friday, July 31, 2020, to file a response. Accordingly, due to this Court's jurisdictional concerns, the motion #17 is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/8/2020. (PSM)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Norfolk Southern's reply is due by 5:00 PM CDT on 7/14/2020. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/1/2020. (LAS2)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief on Motion to Dismiss by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board filed by Danny Bankhead, Rosyln Bankhead, Willie Mae Banks, Doris Blanton, Melissa Brown, Randal Childers, Kernisha Clay, Deborah Coleman, Clint Cook, Clinton Cook, Paula Cook, Crystal Crumpton, Debra Davis, Erica Davis, Delta, Gary Dixon, Sadie Dixon, Stanley Dixon, Julie Duncan, Robert Duncan, Shaneeka Evans, Hosie Franks, Jerry Hill, Ella Horton, George Horton, Alfred Hoskins, Jr, Crea Howard, Jerome Howard, Antonio Howze, Jerimiah Howze, Diane Hubbard, Traci Hubbert, Sr, Quinton Jackon, Estelle Jackson, Larry Johnson, Stevie Johnson, Secunda Kidd, Margaret Kimbrell, Albert Lewis, Deborah Lewis, Florine Lucas, Lilly Madison, Ray Madison, Eric McQuirter, Keleka Mitchell, Melba Nash, Robert Nash, James Odom, Paula Odom, Chris Pugh, Debra Reel, Jessica Rivera, Charles Sanford, Clayton Shanklin, Renae Shanklin, Barbara Sherer, James Smith, Jr, Kim Smith, Veronica Smith, Brandi Softly, Rachel Softly, Thomas Softly, Marshall Speer, Carrington Steward, Resasha Steward, Staci Sudduth, Anquaneida Thomas, Anton Tucker, Bobby Tucker, Cheryl Tucker, De-Markus Tucker, Justice Turner, Belinda Walker, Cherie Weiderholt, Patricia Cook White, Jeremy Windham. (Carmichael, Thomas)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26 Meeting and Report by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/19/2020. (PSM)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for Monday, 6/22/2020 at 03:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on June 18, 2020. (ASL)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge L Scott Coogler. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 6/17/2020 is RESET for Monday, 6/22/2020 at 03:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. The parties are directed to dial 866-390-1828 and use access code 9262283 to participate. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on June 16, 2020. (ASL)
June 16, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board. Responses due by 6/30/2020 Replies due by 7/7/2020. (KAM)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER regarding #5 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. and Norfolk Southern Corporation. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion on or before 6/30/2020, and Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. and Norfolk Southern Corporation shall file a reply on or before 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/16/2020. (KMAW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 11:30 AM on Wednesday, June 17, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 6, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after July 6, 2020. A telephone status conference is SET for 11:30 AM on June 17, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 9262283. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/22/2020. (KEK)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Sky Hauling LLC. filed by Big Sky Hauling LLC (Penfield, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Sky Environmental LLC. filed by Big Sky Environmental LLC (Penfield, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Big Sky Environmental LLC, Big Sky Hauling LLC.(Penfield, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Brief re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action for Referral to the Surface Transportation Board by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Maughan, Diane)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 18, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3592350 (B4601106012). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 2020-11., filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(MRR, ). (Maughan, Diane) Modified on 5/18/2020 (MRR, ).
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc (Maughan, Diane)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Maughan, Diane) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (MRR, ).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER- Motion for Change of Venue/Transfer- GRANTED. Signed by Circuit Judge Talmage Lee Carter on 4/21/20. -Deemed filed 4/21/20, Circuit Court of Marion County 49-cv-2020-900036(MRR, )
May 15, 2020 MOTION to Transfer to Walker County by Rosyln Bankhead et al.-Deemed filed 4/20/20, Circuit Court of Marion County 49-cv-2020-900036 (MRR, )
May 15, 2020 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rosyln Bankhead et al.-Deemed filed 4/14/20, Circuit Court of Marion County 49-cv-2020-900036(MRR, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 2020-11., filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part A, #2 Exhibit 1 Part B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankhead et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Childers
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Dixon
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Cook
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Pugh
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Crumpton
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Brown
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosyln Bankhead
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Bankhead
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Cook
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kernisha Clay
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Blanton
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sanford
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Coleman
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Tucker
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric McQuirter
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Windham
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crea Howard
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Hoskins, Jr
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hubbard
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Tucker
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lewis
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nash
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerimiah Howze
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keleka Mitchell
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Speer
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Howze
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Turner
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renae Shanklin
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Softly
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Sudduth
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rivera
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Madison
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De-Markus Tucker
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Kimbrell
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Odom
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Weiderholt
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Johnson
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Duncan
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anquaneida Thomas
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hill
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Horton
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Smith
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resasha Steward
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Davis
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Nash
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosie Franks
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secunda Kidd
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Howard
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Dixon
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Reel
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Tucker
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith, Jr
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaneeka Evans
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle Jackson
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Smith
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Banks
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine Lucas
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Softly
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilly Madison
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Duncan
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Shanklin
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dixon
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Horton
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Cook
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Jackon
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Softly
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Walker
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Odom
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cook White
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sherer
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lewis
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrington Steward
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Hubbert, Sr
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Davis
Represented By: Thomas L Carmichael
Represented By: David M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sky Environmental LLC
Represented By: Matthew I Penfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: John M Graham
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: John M Graham
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Sky Hauling LLC
Represented By: Matthew I Penfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?