Smothers v. Childers et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Smothers
Defendant: Roger Childers, Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC and Walker County
Case Number: 6:2021cv01057
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Walker County. (Kidd, Jamie)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pamela Smothers. (Diamond, Seth)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC. filed by Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC (Segers, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasper P Juliano on behalf of Roger Childers (Juliano, Jasper)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC.(Segers, Jennifer)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Before the court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #12 . The Motion #12 is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL file the response to Defendant Walker Countys Motion to Dismiss #7 on or before September 20, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/10/2021. (KAM)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Pamela Smothers. (Diamond, Seth)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Walker Countys Motion to Dismiss. Interested parties are DIRECTED to brief the Motion under Exhibit B to the Courts Initial Order. #10 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/9/2021. (KAM)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/27/2021. (KAM)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Roger Childers.(Lee, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Walker County. (McNeill, J)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Walker County. (McNeill, J)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Smothers. Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Diamond, Seth)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Smothers. Roger Childers served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Diamond, Seth)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Smothers. Walker County served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Diamond, Seth) Correcting date served. Modified on 8/5/2021 (KAM, ).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roger Childers, Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC, filed by Pamela Smothers.(Diamond, Seth)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roger Childers, Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC, Walker County delivered to plaintiff first class mail (KAM)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601114961 (KAM)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roger Childers, Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC, Walker County, filed by Pamela Smothers.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smothers v. Childers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Smothers
Represented By: Charles Clyde Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Seth L Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Childers
Represented By: Jasper P Juliano
Represented By: Mark W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preemptive Forensic Health Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Devereaux Segers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?