Aaron et al v. Hudson et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Aaron and Heath Aaron
Defendant: Blake Carter Hudson and Nick Smith
Case Number: 6:2021cv01058
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nick Smith. (McNeill, J)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Opposition to re #4 , #5 to Defendant, Nick Smith's Motion to Dismiss filed by Heath Aaron, Amanda Aaron. (Bradley, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this action will be reassigned to a district judge after 10/17/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 10/6/2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/13/2021. (KAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blake Carter Hudson, Nick Smith mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Nick Smith has filed a #4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before September 16, 2021. Any reply by Defendant Smith should be filed by September 23, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 09/02/2021. (SUH)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nick Smith. (McNeill, J)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Nick Smith. (McNeill, J)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C Sapp on behalf of Heath Aaron, Amanda Aaron (Sapp, Jonathan)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER: The docket sheet does not reflect payment of the filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the fee or file a motion for IFP on or before August 17, 2021 or the complaint will be subject to dismissal without further order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 08/10/2021. (SUH)
August 10, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3900932 (ALND B4601115136) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Blake Carter Hudson, Nick Smith, filed by Amanda Aaron, Heath Aaron.(KAM). (Bradley, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2021 (KEK).
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blake Carter Hudson, Nick Smith, filed by Amanda Aaron, Heath Aaron.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron et al v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Aaron
Represented By: Michael C Bradley
Represented By: Jonathan C Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Aaron
Represented By: Michael C Bradley
Represented By: Jonathan C Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Carter Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Smith
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?