Hampton v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Hampton
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2022cv01226
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Choi on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Choi, Sarah)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/21/2022. (AKD)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/20/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Lorenzo Hampton. (AKD)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Lorenzo Hampton.(AKD)
September 20, 2022 NOTICE that counsel is required to provide plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside the electronic filing system. (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Hampton
Represented By: James A Abernathy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?