Hicks v. Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeff Hicks
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2008cv00536
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Tuscaloosa
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/6/12. (KGE, )
July 5, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/5/12. (KGE, )
July 3, 2012 245 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/3/12. (KGE, )
July 2, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/2/12. (KGE, )
June 29, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/29/12. (KGE)
April 30, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION; Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/30/2012. (BST, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Hicks
Represented By: Donald K McGowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?