Simmons v. Indian Rivers Mental Health Center

Plaintiff: Terri Franks
Defendant: Indian Rivers Mental Health Center
Case Number: 7:2008cv01035
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Tuscaloosa
Presiding Judge: U W Clemon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act (1993)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, as set out. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 3/5/14. (CTS, )
February 7, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 2/7/2014. (KAM, )
September 30, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/30/2012. (KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Indian Rivers Mental Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Franks
Represented By: Kenneth D Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Rivers Mental Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?