Greenwell v. University of Alabama Board of Trustees et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Debbie Greenwell
Defendant: University of Alabama Board of Trustees, Mal Moore, Dave Hart and Robert Witt
Case Number: 7:2011cv02313
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Tuscaloosa
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2011 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dave Hart; University of Alabama Board of Trustees; Robert Witt served on 7/1/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (AVC)
June 30, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Dave Hart, Mal Moore, University of Alabama Board of Trustees, Robert Witt; mailed certified mail. (AVC)
June 28, 2011 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Debbie Greenwell. (AVC)
June 28, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Dave Hart, Mal Moore, University of Alabama Board of Trustees, Robert Witt (Filing fee $ 350.rec# B4601024369), filed by Debbie Greenwell.(KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwell v. University of Alabama Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Greenwell
Represented By: Donna Wesson Smalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Alabama Board of Trustees
Represented By: Melton Chad Tindol
Represented By: Norma M Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mal Moore
Represented By: Melton Chad Tindol
Represented By: Norma M Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Hart
Represented By: Norma M Lemley
Represented By: Melton Chad Tindol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Witt
Represented By: Norma M Lemley
Represented By: Melton Chad Tindol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?