Bowman v. Hodge Management Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Randy Bowman |
Defendant: |
Hodge Management Group LLC, Jerry Hodge, Bank of America NA, Air Bear Inc and Bryan Daniel |
Case Number: |
7:2015cv01318 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Western Office |
County: |
Tuscaloosa |
Presiding Judge: |
John H England |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 17, 2018 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER- There is a question of fact as to the reasonableness of Pltf Randy Bowman's expectation of payment from Air Bear and Hodge; Accordingly, Bowman's motion for summary judgment (Doc 42 ) is DENIED; Defts' motion for summary judgment (Doc 39 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as outlined within; The only remaining claim is Bowman's quantum meruit/implied contract claim against Hodge and Air Bear; The parties are encouraged to discuss alternative dispute resolution, including the potential for mediation facilitated by a United States Magistrate Judge; The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by May 31, 2018, regarding the status of such discussion and whether they believe such mediation would be beneficial to the resolution of the remaining claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/17/18. (MRR, )
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - While it may have been more convenient for the defendants if Bowman had filed this action in Texas, the requirements of due process are met, and Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, (do c. 12) is DENIED. Accordingly, based on the foregoing, Defendants alternative motion to transfer venue is DENIED. For the reasons stated above, the defendants motion to dismiss is DENIED, and their alternative motion to transfer is DENIED. The defendants are directed to answer the complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4). The plaintiffs recently filed motion to amend the scheduling order, (doc. 22), is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to file a jointed proposed amended scheduling order within seven days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/27/2016. (KEK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?